U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-00022-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Goddard et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 09, 2023: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • December 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • December 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • September 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • September 28, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • September 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
June, 2022
  • June 10, 2022: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
May, 2022
  • May 04, 2022: [Order of Detention]
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [Order]
February, 2022
  • February 08, 2022: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
October, 2021
  • October 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
September, 2021
  • September 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
  • August 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
April, 2021
  • April 22, 2021: [Order]
February, 2021
  • February 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
November, 2020
  • November 12, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • November 12, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2020
  • October 22, 2020: [Order]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 14, 2020: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
  • August 14, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 06, 2020: [Order Regarding Motion for Sentence Reduction - FIRST STEP ACT]
March, 2020
  • March 26, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 24, 2020: [First Step Act Order Appointing Counsel]
November, 2019
  • November 08, 2019: [Report and Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
July, 2019
  • July 16, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • May 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • May 23, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • May 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
February, 2019
  • February 21, 2019: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
December, 2018
  • December 17, 2018: [Judgment]
November, 2018
  • November 14, 2018: [Judgment]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [Order to Surrender]
  • October 10, 2018: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • October 08, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
September, 2018
  • September 21, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • September 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
August, 2018
  • August 02, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
July, 2018
  • July 12, 2018: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • July 10, 2018: [Order Modifying Conditions of Pretrial Release]
June, 2018
  • June 20, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 14, 2018: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • June 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
May, 2018
  • May 18, 2018: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • May 15, 2018: [Order]
April, 2018
  • April 20, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 13, 2018: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • April 09, 2018: [Order on Motion for Revocation of Pretrial Release]
  • April 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
March, 2018
  • March 22, 2018: [Order on Motion to Sever Defendant]
  • March 22, 2018: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • March 22, 2018: [Order on Amended Motion]
  • March 22, 2018: [Order on Motion to Adopt]
  • March 05, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • March 01, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2018
  • February 02, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Expert]
  • February 02, 2018: [Order on Amended Motion]
December, 2017
  • December 19, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 13, 2017: [Order]
  • December 11, 2017: [Order on Motion to Modify]
  • December 11, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
November, 2017
  • November 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 07, 2017: [Order]
October, 2017
  • October 25, 2017: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
September, 2017
  • September 20, 2017: [Order of Detention]
August, 2017
  • August 02, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • August 02, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
July, 2017
  • July 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • July 21, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 19, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 19, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • July 18, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • July 06, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
June, 2017
  • June 26, 2017: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • June 16, 2017: [Order]
  • June 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 09, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • June 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Detention]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Order]
  • May 31, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • May 30, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • May 30, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 26, 2017: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • May 26, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • May 26, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • May 26, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 25, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • May 25, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 25, 2017: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • May 24, 2017: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • May 24, 2017: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.