U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-00044-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. PITTS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2017
  • December 05, 2017: [Judgment]
August, 2017
  • August 02, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
July, 2017
  • July 20, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 20, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 11, 2017: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • July 11, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 10, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
June, 2017
  • June 19, 2017: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
May, 2017
  • May 24, 2017: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.