U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-00015-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. LITTLE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • September 30, 2024: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • September 30, 2024: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • October 26, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
April, 2021
  • April 23, 2021: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • April 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • April 23, 2021: [Order on Amended Motion]
  • April 23, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
October, 2020
  • October 01, 2020: [Order]
  • October 01, 2020: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
December, 2019
  • December 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
August, 2018
  • August 24, 2018: [Judgment]
June, 2018
  • June 05, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
January, 2018
  • January 08, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
November, 2017
  • November 01, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2017
  • September 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
July, 2017
  • July 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
June, 2017
  • June 16, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 16, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • June 16, 2017: [Order on Motion for Detention]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.