U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cr-00017-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. MARTIN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
May, 2018
  • May 29, 2018: [Judgment]
September, 2017
  • September 26, 2017: [Order]
  • September 25, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • September 18, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • September 18, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 13, 2017: [Order]
July, 2017
  • July 20, 2017: [Order]
June, 2017
  • June 21, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • June 13, 2017: [Order]
  • June 05, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 05, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.