U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:17-cr-00015-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. HAYNES
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
April, 2018
  • April 18, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 10, 2018: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
March, 2018
  • March 20, 2018: [Judgment]
June, 2017
  • June 06, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • June 06, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • June 01, 2017: [Order of Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.