U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-00017-4
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. WELCH et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
February, 2021
  • February 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
June, 2020
  • June 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
April, 2020
  • April 10, 2020: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • April 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • April 10, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
October, 2019
  • October 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
November, 2018
  • November 16, 2018: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
September, 2018
  • September 18, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • September 17, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
August, 2018
  • August 14, 2018: [Judgment]
June, 2018
  • June 12, 2018: [Judgment]
April, 2018
  • April 17, 2018: [Judgment]
December, 2017
  • December 21, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
November, 2017
  • November 01, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
October, 2017
  • October 30, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2017
  • September 08, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • September 08, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Want of Prosecution]
  • September 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
July, 2017
  • July 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • July 14, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 14, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • July 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • June 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 16, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • June 16, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 13, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • June 13, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 06, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.