U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-00026-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. CULVER et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Order]
April, 2022
  • April 04, 2022: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
March, 2021
  • March 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2021
  • January 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
  • January 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
  • January 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Supplement]
December, 2020
  • December 10, 2020: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
November, 2020
  • November 09, 2020: [Order]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
  • August 09, 2019: [Order]
  • August 06, 2019: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • August 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: [Judgment]
  • May 21, 2019: [Order to Surrender]
April, 2019
  • April 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2019
  • January 22, 2019: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
  • January 18, 2019: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • January 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Bond]
  • January 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • January 03, 2019: [Order]
December, 2018
  • December 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: [Judgment]
  • November 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Judgment of Acquittal]
  • November 16, 2018: [Order to Surrender]
  • November 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Judgment of Acquittal]
October, 2018
  • October 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • October 22, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • October 19, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
September, 2018
  • September 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 11, 2018: [Order]
August, 2018
  • August 20, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • August 09, 2018: [Order]
  • August 02, 2018: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • August 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 25, 2018: [Order]
  • July 13, 2018: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • July 12, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • July 11, 2018: [Order]
May, 2018
  • May 25, 2018: [Order]
  • May 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • May 14, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • May 14, 2018: [Order on Motion to Adopt]
April, 2018
  • April 13, 2018: [Order on Motion to Adopt]
  • April 13, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
December, 2017
  • December 11, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2017
  • November 01, 2017: [Order]
September, 2017
  • September 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2017
  • July 19, 2017: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • July 12, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
June, 2017
  • June 15, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • June 15, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.