U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:09-cr-00032-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Woods et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
  • November 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - FIRST STEP ACT]
  • November 17, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
September, 2021
  • September 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
July, 2021
  • July 15, 2021: [Order]
May, 2021
  • May 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
April, 2021
  • April 21, 2021: [First Step Act Order Appointing Counsel]
March, 2019
  • March 12, 2019: [Order Regarding Motion for Sentence Reduction - FIRST STEP ACT]
April, 2018
  • April 17, 2018: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • April 17, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
June, 2017
  • June 26, 2017: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.