U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cr-00024-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. SMITH et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
November, 2020
  • November 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2018
  • June 07, 2018: [Judgment]
May, 2018
  • May 25, 2018: [Judgment]
  • May 22, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
March, 2018
  • March 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Additional Decrease for Acceptance of Responsibility]
February, 2018
  • February 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • February 08, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • February 07, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • February 07, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • February 07, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
December, 2017
  • December 28, 2017: [Order]
  • December 22, 2017: [Order on Motion for Issuance of Subpoenas]
  • December 22, 2017: [Sealed Order]
  • December 21, 2017: [Sealed Order]
  • December 11, 2017: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Issuance of Subpoenas]
  • September 20, 2017: [Order]
  • September 15, 2017: [Order]
  • September 15, 2017: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Order on Motion for Issuance of Subpoenas]
  • August 10, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
July, 2017
  • July 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • July 19, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 19, 2017: [Order on Motion to Postpone]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • June 27, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • June 27, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • June 26, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.