U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-00023-2
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. STOWE et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
June, 2020
  • June 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
April, 2018
  • April 17, 2018: [Judgment]
March, 2018
  • March 13, 2018: [Judgment]
January, 2018
  • January 25, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
September, 2017
  • September 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
July, 2017
  • July 21, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 21, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • July 21, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 19, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Detention]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.