U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-00013-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. PIKE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
June, 2018
  • June 20, 2018: [Judgment]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Revocation of Pretrial Release]
  • February 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
January, 2018
  • January 24, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2017
  • December 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
November, 2017
  • November 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
October, 2017
  • October 04, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
September, 2017
  • September 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • June 29, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 28, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.