U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-00024-2
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. HULL et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: [Judgment]
  • February 23, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
December, 2017
  • December 21, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
November, 2017
  • November 09, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • November 01, 2017: [Order on Motion in Limine]
October, 2017
  • October 02, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2017
  • September 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • September 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
July, 2017
  • July 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • July 07, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 07, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 06, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.