U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-00037-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. BRINSON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 21, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: [Order on Motion to Modify]
  • July 29, 2019: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence]
  • July 29, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
May, 2018
  • May 17, 2018: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
  • May 10, 2018: [Judgment]
February, 2018
  • February 01, 2018: [Order]
December, 2017
  • December 22, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • December 14, 2017: [Order]
November, 2017
  • November 16, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • November 09, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • November 09, 2017: [Order of Detention]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
August, 2017
  • August 03, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
July, 2017
  • July 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.