U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-00033-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. BOSS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
May, 2019
  • May 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
March, 2019
  • March 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • March 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
January, 2019
  • January 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
November, 2018
  • November 15, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2018
  • September 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
August, 2018
  • August 23, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 23, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 23, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • August 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
July, 2017
  • July 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.