U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-00038-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. HOPKINS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Want of Prosecution]
August, 2019
  • August 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • August 04, 2019: [Order]
February, 2018
  • February 02, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • February 01, 2018: [Order]
December, 2017
  • December 21, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • December 14, 2017: [Order]
October, 2017
  • October 04, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2017
  • September 26, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
August, 2017
  • August 24, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
July, 2017
  • July 20, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.