U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-00049-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. CONSTANZA et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
September, 2020
  • September 04, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
February, 2019
  • February 14, 2019: [Judgment]
December, 2018
  • December 06, 2018: [Judgment]
September, 2018
  • September 05, 2018: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
August, 2018
  • August 22, 2018: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
  • August 16, 2018: [Order]
  • August 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 01, 2018: [Order]
June, 2018
  • June 15, 2018: [Order on Amended Motion]
  • June 15, 2018: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • June 08, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
May, 2018
  • May 29, 2018: [Order]
April, 2018
  • April 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Order]
February, 2018
  • February 08, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • February 01, 2018: [Order]
January, 2018
  • January 23, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • December 14, 2017: [Order]
November, 2017
  • November 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 27, 2017: [Order on Motion to Adopt]
  • November 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 16, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 16, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
October, 2017
  • October 16, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • October 12, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 03, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • October 03, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 03, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
September, 2017
  • September 25, 2017: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.