U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-00048-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. HARRIS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 29, 2018: [Judgment]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
December, 2017
  • December 19, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
November, 2017
  • November 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 15, 2017: [Order]
October, 2017
  • October 19, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • October 19, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 16, 2017: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
September, 2017
  • September 26, 2017: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.