U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-00045-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. WALKER et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2018
  • August 08, 2018: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
June, 2018
  • June 20, 2018: [Judgment]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
January, 2018
  • January 09, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • January 09, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • November 29, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
October, 2017
  • October 24, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • October 24, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 20, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • October 04, 2017: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.