U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-00047-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. BLACK
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 28, 2024: [Report and Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
February, 2019
  • February 22, 2019: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Judgment]
August, 2018
  • August 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2018
  • July 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Order]
  • February 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Revocation of Pretrial Release]
January, 2018
  • January 25, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
December, 2017
  • December 28, 2017: [Order]
November, 2017
  • November 22, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • November 15, 2017: [Order]
  • November 07, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 03, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • November 02, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.