U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cr-00054-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. BATES
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2018
  • August 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Want of Prosecution]
March, 2018
  • March 05, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 05, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
February, 2018
  • February 22, 2018: [Order]
  • February 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Review of Release/Detention Order i/c/w 18 USC 3145]
January, 2018
  • January 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Review of Release/Detention Order i/c/w 18 USC 3145]
  • January 25, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
December, 2017
  • December 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • December 01, 2017: [Order of Detention]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • November 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.