U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-00062-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. COATS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
  • December 16, 2021: [Order]
July, 2018
  • July 23, 2018: [Judgment]
June, 2018
  • June 12, 2018: [Order]
  • June 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
February, 2018
  • February 12, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • February 01, 2018: [Order]
January, 2018
  • January 12, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [Order]
  • December 18, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • December 14, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • December 14, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.