U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cr-00058-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. MENEFEE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Order]
  • May 22, 2020: [Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
March, 2020
  • March 19, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
February, 2020
  • February 12, 2020: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • February 07, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
January, 2020
  • January 24, 2020: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • January 24, 2020: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • January 24, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
April, 2019
  • April 22, 2019: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
June, 2018
  • June 12, 2018: [Judgment]
January, 2018
  • January 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
December, 2017
  • December 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • December 01, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • December 01, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.