U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-00005-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. DOUGLAS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 26, 2020: [Judgment]
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 16, 2020: [Order]
January, 2020
  • January 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Order]
  • November 14, 2019: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • November 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Expert Services]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 12, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
July, 2019
  • July 08, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Order]
  • April 24, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • February 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Psychiatric Exam]
January, 2019
  • January 02, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
December, 2018
  • December 07, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 07, 2018: [Order]
  • December 03, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
September, 2018
  • September 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
May, 2018
  • May 03, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • March 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Detention]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • February 26, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
January, 2018
  • January 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.