U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-00044-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. WALKER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 08, 2019: [Judgment]
January, 2019
  • January 09, 2019: [Order to Surrender]
  • January 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • January 08, 2019: [Order on Motion to Strike]
July, 2018
  • July 02, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
May, 2018
  • May 03, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
January, 2018
  • January 24, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • January 24, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 24, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.