U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-00004-2
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. HATFIELD et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 20, 2018: [Judgment]
June, 2018
  • June 20, 2018: [Order on Joint Motion]
March, 2018
  • March 01, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • February 09, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • February 09, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 08, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.