U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-00016-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. MIZE et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 01, 2022: [Repayment Agreement and Order]
April, 2021
  • April 15, 2021: [Repayment Agreement and Order]
March, 2019
  • March 08, 2019: [Judgment]
  • March 08, 2019: [Order to Surrender]
  • March 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 07, 2019: [Judgment]
  • March 07, 2019: [Order to Surrender]
  • March 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
May, 2018
  • May 01, 2018: [Order]
April, 2018
  • April 10, 2018: [Order on Motion to Declare Case Complex]
March, 2018
  • March 16, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 16, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • March 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.