U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:18-cr-00010-2
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. HILL et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
March, 2019
  • March 18, 2019: [Order Regarding Motion for Sentence Reduction - FIRST STEP ACT]
January, 2019
  • January 18, 2019: [Judgment]
July, 2018
  • July 06, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • July 03, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
June, 2018
  • June 12, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • June 12, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
May, 2018
  • May 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • May 24, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • May 02, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
April, 2018
  • April 24, 2018: [Order]
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 22, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 22, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • March 22, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.