U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-00013-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. MOORE et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Repayment Agreement and Order]
July, 2020
  • July 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Order on Motion to Surrender]
  • March 13, 2020: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
  • March 06, 2020: [Judgment]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Order to Surrender]
  • February 18, 2020: [Order to Surrender]
November, 2019
  • November 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
July, 2019
  • July 02, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
May, 2019
  • May 17, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2019
  • March 22, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • January 11, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • January 09, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • January 09, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
November, 2018
  • November 15, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2018
  • September 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
July, 2018
  • July 24, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
May, 2018
  • May 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
April, 2018
  • April 18, 2018: [Protective Order]
  • April 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
March, 2018
  • March 22, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.