U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-00020-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. BENNETT
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Report and Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
August, 2020
  • August 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2020
  • April 03, 2020: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • April 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • April 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 02, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
December, 2019
  • December 12, 2019: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
  • December 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 09, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
October, 2019
  • October 09, 2019: [Order]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • September 11, 2019: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
September, 2018
  • September 25, 2018: [Judgment]
August, 2018
  • August 28, 2018: [Order]
May, 2018
  • May 29, 2018: [Order]
April, 2018
  • April 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 26, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • April 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.