U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-00034-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. SEARCY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 07, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2019
  • October 08, 2019: [Judgment]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: [Order]
April, 2019
  • April 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • April 05, 2019: [Order]
  • April 03, 2019: [Order of Detention]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: [Order]
February, 2019
  • February 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • February 12, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • February 07, 2019: [Order]
December, 2018
  • December 17, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 07, 2018: [Order]
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 21, 2018: [Order]
August, 2018
  • August 13, 2018: [Order of Commitment]
  • August 10, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 01, 2018: [Order]
June, 2018
  • June 08, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
May, 2018
  • May 29, 2018: [Order]
April, 2018
  • April 20, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • April 20, 2018: [Order on Motion for Psychiatric Exam]
  • April 20, 2018: [Order]
  • April 19, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.