U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-00035-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. WOOTEN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
  • July 26, 2022: [Order to Surrender]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
April, 2022
  • April 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Order]
  • November 19, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
October, 2020
  • October 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2018
  • October 17, 2018: [Judgment]
June, 2018
  • June 07, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • April 20, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • April 19, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • April 19, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.