U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-00031-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. GORDY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Judgment]
  • October 15, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
July, 2018
  • July 25, 2018: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
June, 2018
  • June 08, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
May, 2018
  • May 04, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • May 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2018
  • April 20, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • April 20, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • April 19, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • April 19, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.