U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-00017-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. ABRAM
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 17, 2018: [Order of Dismissal]
  • December 06, 2018: [Order]
October, 2018
  • October 09, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2018
  • September 21, 2018: [Order]
August, 2018
  • August 10, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • August 01, 2018: [Order]
June, 2018
  • June 08, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
May, 2018
  • May 29, 2018: [Order]
April, 2018
  • April 23, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • April 23, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 23, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 18, 2018: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.