U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00012-11
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. ALFORD et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • September 19, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 15, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • March 15, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 15, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
June, 2021
  • June 10, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • June 10, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
May, 2021
  • May 11, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
February, 2021
  • February 16, 2021: [Report and Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
May, 2020
  • May 18, 2020: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
  • May 04, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 03, 2020: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
February, 2020
  • February 24, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • February 20, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
January, 2020
  • January 24, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • January 24, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
December, 2019
  • December 27, 2019: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
November, 2019
  • November 08, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • November 08, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Judgment]
  • March 15, 2019: [Order to Surrender]
  • March 05, 2019: [Judgment]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • January 29, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
December, 2018
  • December 03, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2018
  • September 20, 2018: [Order]
  • September 10, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 07, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
July, 2018
  • July 10, 2018: [Order]
June, 2018
  • June 25, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • June 12, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • June 12, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 12, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 06, 2018: [Order]
May, 2018
  • May 14, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • May 10, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • May 10, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 09, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • May 09, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • May 09, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 07, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 18, 2018: [Order]
  • April 18, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.