U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:18-cr-00018-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. MASK
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 28, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
August, 2018
  • August 03, 2018: [Order on Motion for Additional Decrease for Acceptance of Responsibility]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Judgment]
  • July 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2018
  • April 26, 2018: [Order]
  • April 24, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • April 24, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • April 23, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.