U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00008-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. SAVAGE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • March 29, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • March 29, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • March 29, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Judgment]
  • January 24, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
July, 2018
  • July 20, 2018: [Order]
  • July 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
June, 2018
  • June 08, 2018: [Order]
May, 2018
  • May 25, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • May 24, 2018: [Order on Motion for Review of Release/Detention Order i/c/w 18 USC 3145]
  • May 24, 2018: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • May 22, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • May 22, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • May 22, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
April, 2018
  • April 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.