U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-00037-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. PARAMO et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 11, 2021: [Repayment Agreement and Order]
August, 2019
  • August 19, 2019: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
July, 2019
  • July 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 15, 2019: [Judgment]
February, 2019
  • February 06, 2019: [Judgment]
  • February 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
November, 2018
  • November 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Travel]
  • November 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 15, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 15, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
October, 2018
  • October 19, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
August, 2018
  • August 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to File Additional Motions]
  • August 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Travel]
  • August 16, 2018: [Order on Joint Motion]
  • August 07, 2018: [Order on Motion to Travel]
July, 2018
  • July 25, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • June 20, 2018: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 20, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • June 20, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
May, 2018
  • May 29, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • May 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • May 07, 2018: [Order]
  • May 04, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • April 27, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 26, 2018: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • April 26, 2018: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.