U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:18-cr-00006-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. MANNING
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
May, 2020
  • May 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
March, 2019
  • March 08, 2019: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
May, 2018
  • May 15, 2018: [Judgment]
  • May 09, 2018: [Order to Surrender]
  • May 07, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.