U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:18-cr-00019-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. MOSS et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Repayment Agreement and Order]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Repayment Agreement and Order]
July, 2020
  • July 27, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
December, 2019
  • December 12, 2019: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • December 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • December 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 10, 2019: [Order on Amended Motion]
November, 2019
  • November 04, 2019: [Judgment]
October, 2019
  • October 29, 2019: [Order to Surrender]
  • October 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
September, 2019
  • September 19, 2019: [Order on Joint Motion]
August, 2019
  • August 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
July, 2019
  • July 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for New Trial]
  • July 15, 2019: [Order on Joint Motion]
  • July 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Strike]
May, 2019
  • May 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • May 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • April 12, 2019: [Order]
  • April 10, 2019: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • April 10, 2019: [Order on Motion in Limine]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 15, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
September, 2018
  • September 07, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
August, 2018
  • August 01, 2018: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
July, 2018
  • July 17, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 09, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • July 09, 2018: [Order on Amended Motion]
June, 2018
  • June 12, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 12, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
May, 2018
  • May 15, 2018: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.