U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-00023-2
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. LOPEZ et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
October, 2020
  • October 05, 2020: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • October 05, 2020: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • October 05, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
August, 2020
  • August 04, 2020: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 15, 2020: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
  • June 08, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 04, 2020: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • June 04, 2020: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • June 04, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
  • March 25, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 24, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
January, 2020
  • January 13, 2020: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
August, 2019
  • August 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence]
February, 2019
  • February 12, 2019: [Judgment]
August, 2018
  • August 10, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
June, 2018
  • June 04, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • May 30, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 30, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • May 25, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • May 21, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • May 21, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 21, 2018: [Order]
  • May 18, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.