U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00019-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. DOUGLAS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
November, 2019
  • November 12, 2019: [Order]
October, 2019
  • October 17, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 10, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 10, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
March, 2019
  • March 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Order]
June, 2018
  • June 18, 2018: [Order on Amended Motion]
May, 2018
  • May 24, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • May 24, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • May 24, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.