U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-00027-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. HOUSER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 12, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: [Judgment]
January, 2019
  • January 07, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
December, 2018
  • December 12, 2018: [Report and Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
November, 2018
  • November 06, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2018
  • September 11, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • June 06, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • June 06, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • June 06, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
May, 2018
  • May 24, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.