U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-00023-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. TRUITT et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 06, 2019: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
August, 2019
  • August 12, 2019: [Judgment]
March, 2019
  • March 08, 2019: [Judgment]
February, 2019
  • February 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
January, 2019
  • January 18, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 10, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
November, 2018
  • November 13, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
October, 2018
  • October 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • October 05, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • October 04, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
September, 2018
  • September 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • September 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • June 22, 2018: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 22, 2018: [Order on Amended Motion]
  • June 21, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • June 21, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
May, 2018
  • May 29, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.