U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-00010-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. TWILLEY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2019
  • April 19, 2019: [Judgment]
December, 2018
  • December 19, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 06, 2018: [Order]
October, 2018
  • October 02, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
September, 2018
  • September 21, 2018: [Order]
August, 2018
  • August 10, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 01, 2018: [Order]
June, 2018
  • June 19, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • June 15, 2018: [Order]
  • June 14, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • June 14, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • June 14, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.