U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:18-cr-00012-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. FRASCH
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Want of Prosecution]
October, 2018
  • October 15, 2018: [Order on Motion to Declare Case Complex]
July, 2018
  • July 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • July 17, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 09, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
June, 2018
  • June 15, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • June 15, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • June 15, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.