U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:18-cr-00011-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. SCOTT
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 18, 2020: [Order]
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
July, 2019
  • July 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
May, 2019
  • May 21, 2019: [Order]
April, 2019
  • April 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
July, 2018
  • July 12, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • July 12, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 11, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
June, 2018
  • June 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.