U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-00044-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. CAMPBELL
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel]
February, 2019
  • February 06, 2019: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
December, 2018
  • December 18, 2018: [Judgment]
June, 2018
  • June 18, 2018: [Order]
  • June 15, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • June 15, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.