U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-00030-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. RANDALL et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
October, 2019
  • October 17, 2019: [Judgment]
September, 2019
  • September 17, 2019: [Judgment]
July, 2019
  • July 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
June, 2019
  • June 14, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
December, 2018
  • December 13, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
November, 2018
  • November 13, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • November 06, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2018
  • September 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • September 11, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • June 28, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • June 22, 2018: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 21, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 21, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • June 21, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 19, 2018: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.