U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-00027-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. WARNER et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence]
  • May 28, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Judgment]
  • February 27, 2019: [Judgment]
November, 2018
  • November 26, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: [Order Modifying Conditions of Pretrial Release]
  • September 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • September 12, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • September 12, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • September 11, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
August, 2018
  • August 23, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
June, 2018
  • June 21, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • June 21, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.