U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-00034-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. DAVIS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
November, 2018
  • November 13, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2018
  • September 11, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
August, 2018
  • August 09, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
July, 2018
  • July 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • July 05, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 05, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
June, 2018
  • June 22, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.